Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6]* 02/28/2011
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 02/28/2011
Rep. Cravaack, Chip [R-MN-8]* 02/28/2011
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 02/28/2011
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5]* 02/28/2011
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10]* 02/28/2011
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 03/02/2011
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 03/11/2011
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 04/13/2011
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 04/14/2011
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 05/10/2011
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 06/14/2011
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 06/21/2011