Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 03/01/2011
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 03/01/2011
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 03/01/2011
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10]* 03/01/2011
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 03/10/2011
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 03/10/2011
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 03/10/2011
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 03/15/2011
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 03/29/2011
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 04/15/2011
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 07/12/2011
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 09/07/2011