Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 02/08/2011
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 02/08/2011
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 02/09/2011
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 03/29/2011
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 05/10/2011
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 05/11/2011
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 06/01/2011
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 06/01/2011
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 06/02/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 06/03/2011
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 06/14/2011
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 06/14/2011
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 06/14/2011
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 06/14/2011
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 06/24/2011
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-33] 07/06/2011
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 07/27/2011
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 07/27/2011
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 09/20/2011
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 10/04/2011
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 11/03/2011
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 11/30/2011
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 12/13/2011
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 01/27/2012
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 02/03/2012
Rep. Clarke, Hansen [D-MI-13] 03/05/2012
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 04/16/2012
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 04/24/2012
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 04/24/2012
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 04/26/2012
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 04/26/2012
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 05/07/2012
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 06/05/2012