Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 03/17/2011
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 05/02/2011
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 06/02/2011
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-33] 07/06/2011
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 09/12/2011