Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 03/01/2011
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 03/03/2011
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 03/03/2011
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 03/09/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 03/09/2011
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 03/09/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 03/11/2011
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 03/15/2011
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 03/15/2011
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 03/15/2011
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 03/15/2011
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 03/16/2011
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 03/16/2011
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 03/30/2011
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/30/2011
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 04/04/2011
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 04/14/2011
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 05/13/2011
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 07/07/2011
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 07/07/2011
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 07/07/2011
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 07/07/2011
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 07/07/2011
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 07/07/2011
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 07/13/2011
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 07/13/2011
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 07/13/2011
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 11/02/2011
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 11/14/2011
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 11/14/2011
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 11/15/2011
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 11/18/2011