Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 05/12/2011
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 05/31/2011
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 07/08/2011
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 09/07/2011
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 02/08/2012
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 04/16/2012