Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 01/18/2011
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 01/18/2011
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12] 01/18/2011
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 07/21/2011
Rep. Walsh, Joe [R-IL-8] 07/25/2011
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 08/05/2011
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 12/07/2011
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 05/30/2012
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-5] 07/26/2012
Rep. Quayle, Benjamin [R-AZ-3] 07/26/2012