Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2]* 03/02/2011
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43]* 03/02/2011
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7]* 03/02/2011
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3]* 03/02/2011
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 03/02/2011
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 03/02/2011
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6]* 03/02/2011
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 03/02/2011
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 03/02/2011
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 03/02/2011
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1]* 03/02/2011
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large]* 03/02/2011
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 03/02/2011
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8]* 03/02/2011
Rep. Schilling, Robert T. [R-IL-17]* 03/02/2011
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20]* 03/02/2011
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3]* 03/02/2011
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-23]* 03/02/2011
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16]* 03/02/2011
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18]* 03/02/2011
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 03/02/2011
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 03/08/2011
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-19] 03/08/2011
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 03/08/2011
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 03/08/2011
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 03/08/2011
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 03/08/2011
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 03/08/2011
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 03/08/2011
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 03/08/2011
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 03/08/2011
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 03/08/2011
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-20] 03/08/2011
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 03/08/2011
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1] 03/08/2011
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 03/08/2011
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 03/08/2011
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 03/08/2011
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 03/08/2011
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 03/08/2011
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 03/08/2011
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 03/08/2011
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 03/08/2011
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 03/08/2011
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 03/08/2011
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/08/2011
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 03/08/2011
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/08/2011
Rep. Roby, Martha [R-AL-2] 03/08/2011
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 03/08/2011
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 03/08/2011
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 03/08/2011
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 03/08/2011
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 03/08/2011
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 03/08/2011
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 03/08/2011
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 03/08/2011
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 03/08/2011
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 03/08/2011
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3] 03/09/2011
Rep. Labrador, Raul R. [R-ID-1] 03/09/2011
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 03/09/2011
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 03/09/2011
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large] 03/09/2011
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7] 03/11/2011
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 03/11/2011
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 03/11/2011
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 03/11/2011
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4] 03/11/2011
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 03/11/2011
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 03/11/2011
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 03/11/2011
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 03/11/2011
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 03/11/2011
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 03/11/2011
Rep. Critz, Mark S. [D-PA-12] 03/11/2011
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 03/11/2011
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 03/11/2011
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 03/15/2011
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 03/15/2011
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 03/15/2011
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 03/15/2011
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5] 03/15/2011
Rep. Landry, Jeffrey M. [R-LA-3] 03/15/2011
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 03/15/2011
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 03/15/2011
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 03/15/2011
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 03/15/2011
Rep. Canseco, Francisco "Quico" [R-TX-23] 03/15/2011
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 03/15/2011
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2] 03/15/2011
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 03/15/2011
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 03/15/2011
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 03/16/2011
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 03/16/2011
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 03/16/2011
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 03/16/2011
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 03/17/2011
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 03/17/2011
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 03/17/2011
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 03/17/2011
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 03/17/2011
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 03/17/2011
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 03/17/2011
Rep. Austria, Steve [R-OH-7] 03/17/2011
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 03/29/2011
Rep. Hurt, Robert [R-VA-5] 03/29/2011
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 03/29/2011
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 03/29/2011
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 03/29/2011
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 03/29/2011
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 03/29/2011
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 03/29/2011
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 03/29/2011
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 03/29/2011
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 03/29/2011
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 03/29/2011
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 03/29/2011
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 03/29/2011
Rep. Berg, Rick [R-ND-At Large] 03/29/2011
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-29] 03/29/2011
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 03/29/2011
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 03/29/2011
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 03/29/2011
Rep. Cravaack, Chip [R-MN-8] 03/29/2011
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 03/29/2011
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 03/29/2011
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 03/29/2011
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 03/29/2011
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 03/29/2011
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 03/29/2011
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 03/29/2011
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4] 03/29/2011
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 03/29/2011
Rep. Dold, Robert J. [R-IL-10] 03/29/2011
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 03/29/2011
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 03/29/2011