Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20]* 03/02/2011
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 04/12/2011
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 04/12/2011
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 04/12/2011
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 04/12/2011
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 04/14/2011
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 04/15/2011
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 05/02/2011
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 05/02/2011
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 05/02/2011