Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 03/02/2011
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8]* 03/02/2011
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15]* 03/02/2011
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6]* 03/02/2011
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3]* 03/02/2011
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 03/02/2011
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 03/03/2011
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 03/09/2011
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 03/15/2011
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 03/15/2011
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 03/15/2011
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 04/08/2011
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 05/05/2011
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 06/13/2011
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 06/21/2011
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 10/24/2011
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 11/10/2011
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 11/10/2011
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 12/01/2011