Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 03/17/2011
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 03/17/2011
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 04/12/2011
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 05/02/2011
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 05/13/2011
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-19] 06/14/2011
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 08/05/2011
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 09/08/2011
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 10/05/2011
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 04/18/2012
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 06/26/2012