Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 03/10/2011
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 03/10/2011
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 03/10/2011
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 03/14/2011
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/14/2011
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 03/14/2011
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 03/14/2011
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 03/14/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 03/14/2011
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 03/14/2011
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 03/30/2011
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 03/30/2011
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 03/31/2011
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 03/31/2011
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 03/31/2011
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 04/05/2011
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 04/08/2011
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 04/15/2011
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 04/15/2011
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 05/03/2011
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 05/10/2011
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 06/01/2011
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 06/02/2011
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 06/13/2011
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 07/06/2011
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 08/01/2011
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 09/07/2011
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 09/07/2011
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 09/07/2011
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 09/20/2011
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 10/12/2011
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 12/13/2011
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 01/18/2012