Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 03/02/2011
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 03/02/2011
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 03/03/2011
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 03/03/2011
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 03/08/2011
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 03/08/2011
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 03/08/2011
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 03/08/2011
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 03/08/2011
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 03/08/2011
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 03/08/2011
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 03/08/2011
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 03/10/2011
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 03/10/2011
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 03/14/2011
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 03/29/2011
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 03/29/2011
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 03/29/2011
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 03/29/2011
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 04/13/2011
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 05/03/2011
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 05/03/2011
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 07/08/2011
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 07/08/2011
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 07/08/2011
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 07/08/2011
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 07/08/2011
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 07/08/2011
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 07/08/2011
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 07/14/2011
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 07/14/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 07/14/2011
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 07/14/2011
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 07/21/2011
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 07/21/2011
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 07/21/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 07/26/2011
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 07/26/2011
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 08/01/2011
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 10/11/2011
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 10/11/2011
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 10/24/2011
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 11/14/2011
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 11/15/2011
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 11/16/2011
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 12/01/2011
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 03/07/2012
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 03/22/2012
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 03/30/2012
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 04/16/2012
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 04/16/2012
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 04/25/2012
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 04/25/2012
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 04/25/2012
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 04/26/2012
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 04/26/2012
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-23] 04/26/2012
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 04/26/2012
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen W. [D-HI-1] 04/26/2012
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 04/26/2012
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 04/26/2012
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 04/26/2012
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 04/26/2012
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 05/09/2012
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 05/09/2012
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 05/09/2012
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 05/09/2012
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 05/09/2012
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 05/17/2012
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 06/06/2012
Rep. Clarke, Hansen [D-MI-13] 06/06/2012