Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1]* 03/03/2011
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10]* 03/03/2011
Rep. Clarke, Hansen [D-MI-13]* 03/03/2011
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 03/03/2011
Rep. Amash, Justin [R-MI-3]* 03/03/2011
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 03/03/2011
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2]* 03/03/2011
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9]* 03/03/2011
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8]* 03/03/2011
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 03/03/2011
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12]* 03/03/2011
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 03/03/2011
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15]* 03/03/2011
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7]* 03/03/2011
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 03/03/2011
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 03/03/2011
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 03/03/2011
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 03/03/2011
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27]* 03/03/2011
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 03/03/2011
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 03/03/2011
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 03/11/2011
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 03/11/2011
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 03/11/2011
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 03/11/2011
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 03/17/2011
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 05/11/2011
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 05/13/2011
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 09/09/2011
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 09/13/2011
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 10/06/2011
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 10/26/2011
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 10/26/2011
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 02/14/2012
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 02/27/2012
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 02/29/2012