Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 03/03/2011
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 03/10/2011
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 03/10/2011
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 03/14/2011
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 03/14/2011
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 03/14/2011
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 03/14/2011
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 03/14/2011
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 03/16/2011
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 03/16/2011
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 03/16/2011
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 03/16/2011
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 03/17/2011
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 03/31/2011
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 03/31/2011
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 03/31/2011
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 03/31/2011
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 03/31/2011
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/31/2011
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 03/31/2011
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52] 03/31/2011
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-20] 04/05/2011
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 04/06/2011
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 04/06/2011
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 04/06/2011
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 04/06/2011
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 04/08/2011
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 04/08/2011
Rep. Buerkle, Ann Marie [R-NY-25] 04/14/2011
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 05/03/2011
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 05/25/2011
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 09/20/2011
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 03/19/2012
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 03/21/2012