Refine your search

Refined by:

Texas Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 03/22/2012
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 03/26/2012
Rep. Canseco, Francisco "Quico" [R-TX-23] 03/26/2012
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 03/27/2012
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 03/28/2012
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 04/10/2012