Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 03/09/2011
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 03/09/2011
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/09/2011
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 03/11/2011
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 03/14/2011
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 03/16/2011
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 03/16/2011
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 03/17/2011
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 03/30/2011
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 06/01/2011
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 10/25/2011