Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1]* 03/03/2011
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 03/03/2011
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7]* 03/03/2011
Rep. West, Allen B. [R-FL-22] 03/08/2011
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 03/08/2011
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 03/08/2011
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 03/08/2011
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 03/11/2011
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 03/11/2011
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 03/29/2011
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 03/29/2011
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 03/29/2011
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 03/29/2011
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 03/29/2011
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 03/29/2011
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-19] 04/05/2011
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 04/05/2011
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 04/05/2011
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 04/05/2011
Rep. Walsh, Joe [R-IL-8] 04/05/2011
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-11] 04/08/2011
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 04/08/2011
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 04/13/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 04/13/2011
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 04/13/2011
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 05/05/2011
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 05/06/2011
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 05/13/2011
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 05/13/2011
Rep. Herrera Beutler, Jaime [R-WA-3] 05/24/2011
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3] 06/01/2011
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 07/12/2011
Rep. Schilling, Robert T. [R-IL-17] 09/13/2011
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 09/22/2011
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 11/02/2011
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 01/27/2012
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4] 03/29/2012
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 04/18/2012
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 05/16/2012
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 05/17/2012
Rep. Hochul, Kathleen C. [D-NY-26] 05/17/2012
Rep. Adams, Sandy [R-FL-24] 05/31/2012
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 06/01/2012
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 06/06/2012
Rep. Critz, Mark S. [D-PA-12] 06/06/2012
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 06/06/2012
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2] 06/06/2012
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 06/19/2012
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 06/19/2012
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-20] 06/20/2012
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 06/27/2012
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 07/10/2012
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-23] 07/11/2012
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 07/31/2012
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 09/21/2012
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 10/16/2012