Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 03/03/2011
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21]* 03/03/2011
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 03/03/2011
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 03/03/2011
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 03/03/2011
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 03/03/2011
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 03/03/2011
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 03/03/2011
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8]* 03/03/2011
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 03/03/2011
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 03/03/2011
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 03/03/2011
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6]* 03/03/2011
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 03/03/2011
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 03/03/2011
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4]* 03/03/2011
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 03/15/2011
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 03/29/2011
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 03/29/2011
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7] 03/29/2011
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 03/29/2011
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 04/06/2011
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 04/06/2011
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 04/06/2011
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 04/06/2011
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 04/13/2011
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 04/13/2011
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 05/02/2011
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 05/02/2011
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 05/10/2011
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 05/10/2011
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 05/23/2011
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 05/23/2011
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 05/23/2011
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 05/24/2011
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 05/26/2011
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 06/13/2011
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 06/13/2011
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 06/21/2011
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 06/22/2011
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 06/24/2011
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 07/05/2011
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 09/07/2011
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 09/13/2011
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 10/05/2011
Rep. Austria, Steve [R-OH-7] 10/24/2011
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 12/07/2011
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-20] 12/19/2011
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 01/23/2012
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 04/25/2012
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 04/27/2012
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 05/08/2012
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 06/05/2012
Rep. Webster, Daniel [R-FL-8] 06/08/2012
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 06/18/2012
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 06/19/2012
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 06/27/2012
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 06/27/2012
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 07/11/2012
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 07/11/2012
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 07/11/2012
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-5] 07/17/2012
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 07/18/2012
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 07/24/2012
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 07/24/2012
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-11] 08/02/2012
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 08/02/2012
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9] 08/02/2012
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 08/02/2012
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 09/10/2012
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 09/10/2012
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 09/10/2012
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 09/11/2012
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 09/21/2012
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 09/28/2012
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 09/28/2012
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 12/17/2012