Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 03/03/2011
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1]* 03/03/2011
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 03/03/2011
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 03/03/2011
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 03/03/2011
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-26]* 03/03/2011
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3]* 03/03/2011
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 03/03/2011
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8]* 03/03/2011
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6]* 03/03/2011
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 03/03/2011
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1]* 03/03/2011
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 03/03/2011
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10]* 03/03/2011
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 03/03/2011
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 03/03/2011
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44]* 03/03/2011
Rep. Canseco, Francisco "Quico" [R-TX-23]* 03/03/2011
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6]* 03/03/2011
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 03/03/2011
Rep. Cravaack, Chip [R-MN-8]* 03/03/2011
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 03/03/2011
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 03/03/2011
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 03/03/2011
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8]* 03/03/2011
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 03/03/2011
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 03/03/2011
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-13]* 03/03/2011
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3]* 03/03/2011
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 03/03/2011
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2]* 03/03/2011
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2]* 03/03/2011
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 03/03/2011
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14]* 03/03/2011
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large]* 03/03/2011
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24]* 03/03/2011
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 03/03/2011
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10]* 03/03/2011
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10]* 03/03/2011
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2]* 03/03/2011
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 03/03/2011
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large]* 03/03/2011
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18]* 03/03/2011
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 03/03/2011
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9]* 03/03/2011
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1]* 03/03/2011
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 03/03/2011
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5]* 03/03/2011
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 03/03/2011
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3]* 03/03/2011
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7]* 03/03/2011
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 03/03/2011
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3]* 03/03/2011
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3]* 03/03/2011
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 03/03/2011
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-41] 03/04/2011
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 03/04/2011
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 03/08/2011
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 03/08/2011
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 03/08/2011
Rep. Guinta, Frank C. [R-NH-1] 03/10/2011
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 03/10/2011
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 03/10/2011
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-11] 03/11/2011
Rep. Quayle, Benjamin [R-AZ-3] 03/14/2011
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 03/16/2011
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52] 03/16/2011
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 03/30/2011
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 03/30/2011
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 04/01/2011
Rep. Austria, Steve [R-OH-7] 04/12/2011
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 04/15/2011
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 09/08/2011