Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 01/05/2011
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Buerkle, Ann Marie [R-NY-25]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 01/19/2011
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 01/19/2011
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 01/19/2011
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 01/19/2011
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 01/19/2011
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 01/19/2011
Rep. Woodall, Rob [R-GA-7] 01/19/2011
Rep. Quayle, Benjamin [R-AZ-3] 02/10/2011
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 02/10/2011
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 02/10/2011
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-5] 02/10/2011
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 03/01/2011
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 03/01/2011
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 03/01/2011
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 03/09/2011
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 03/09/2011
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 03/09/2011
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 03/09/2011
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 03/09/2011
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 03/09/2011
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 03/09/2011
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 03/09/2011
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 03/09/2011
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 03/09/2011
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 03/09/2011
Rep. Rigell, E. Scott [R-VA-2] 03/09/2011
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 03/09/2011
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 03/09/2011
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 03/09/2011
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 03/09/2011
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 03/09/2011
Rep. Walsh, Joe [R-IL-8] 03/09/2011
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 03/09/2011
Rep. West, Allen B. [R-FL-22] 03/09/2011
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 03/09/2011
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 03/09/2011
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 03/17/2011
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-18] 03/17/2011
Rep. Adams, Sandy [R-FL-24] 03/17/2011
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 03/17/2011
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 05/26/2011
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 05/26/2011
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 05/26/2011
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 05/26/2011
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 05/26/2011
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-20] 05/26/2011
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 05/26/2011
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large] 05/26/2011
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9] 06/01/2011
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 06/02/2011
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 06/15/2011
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 06/15/2011
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 06/15/2011
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 06/15/2011
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 06/15/2011
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 06/24/2011

Show cosponsors who withdrew