Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 03/14/2011
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 03/14/2011
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-17] 03/14/2011
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 03/16/2011
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 03/16/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 03/16/2011
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 03/16/2011
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 03/16/2011
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 03/16/2011
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 03/30/2011
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 03/30/2011
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 03/30/2011
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 03/30/2011
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 04/01/2011
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 04/01/2011
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 04/05/2011
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 04/08/2011
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 10/04/2011
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 10/12/2011
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 02/17/2012
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 02/27/2012
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 05/08/2012
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 05/08/2012
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 05/08/2012
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 05/08/2012
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 05/08/2012
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 05/08/2012
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 05/09/2012
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3] 05/17/2012
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 05/30/2012
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 05/30/2012
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 06/19/2012
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 06/20/2012
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 07/17/2012