Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 03/03/2011
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4]* 03/03/2011
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2]* 03/03/2011
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 03/03/2011
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6]* 03/03/2011
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 03/03/2011
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5]* 03/03/2011
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1]* 03/03/2011
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 03/03/2011
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3]* 03/03/2011
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 03/03/2011
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 03/16/2011
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 03/16/2011
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 03/16/2011
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 03/30/2011
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 03/30/2011
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 04/14/2011
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12] 05/03/2011
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 05/04/2011
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 05/23/2011
Rep. Amash, Justin [R-MI-3] 05/31/2011
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 06/15/2011
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 06/24/2011
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1] 07/06/2011
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 07/06/2011
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 07/11/2011
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 07/12/2011
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 09/14/2011
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 10/21/2011
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 10/26/2011
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 11/04/2011
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 11/22/2011
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 01/17/2012
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 01/17/2012
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 01/23/2012
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 01/23/2012
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 02/07/2012
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 02/16/2012
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 02/16/2012
Rep. Canseco, Francisco "Quico" [R-TX-23] 02/16/2012
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 02/16/2012
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 02/16/2012
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 02/16/2012
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 02/16/2012
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-21] 02/16/2012
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 02/16/2012
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 02/16/2012
Rep. Woodall, Rob [R-GA-7] 02/16/2012
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 02/24/2012
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 02/27/2012
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 03/05/2012
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 03/05/2012
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 03/07/2012
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 03/07/2012
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 03/07/2012
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4] 03/07/2012
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 03/08/2012
Rep. Walsh, Joe [R-IL-8] 03/08/2012
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-9] 03/29/2012
Rep. Adams, Sandy [R-FL-24] 04/16/2012
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 04/16/2012
Rep. Landry, Jeffrey M. [R-LA-3] 05/08/2012
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 05/08/2012
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 05/10/2012
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 05/10/2012
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 06/19/2012
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-23] 07/19/2012
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 07/19/2012
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 07/19/2012
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 07/31/2012