Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5]* 03/03/2011
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6]* 03/03/2011
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8]* 03/03/2011
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2]* 03/03/2011
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 05/13/2011
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 05/13/2011
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 05/13/2011
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 05/26/2011
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 05/26/2011
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 06/24/2011
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 09/15/2011
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 12/02/2011