There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Rising Tides Act of 2011

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to reduce the corporate rate of tax and to change to a more territorial method of taxing corporations.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
03/04/2011Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date
03/04/2011Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/04/2011Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (63)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 03/14/2011
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-9] 03/14/2011
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 03/14/2011
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12] 03/14/2011
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 03/14/2011
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 03/14/2011
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 03/14/2011
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 03/14/2011
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3] 03/14/2011
Rep. Buerkle, Ann Marie [R-NY-25] 03/14/2011
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 03/14/2011
Rep. Adams, Sandy [R-FL-24] 03/14/2011
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 03/14/2011
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 03/14/2011
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 03/14/2011
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 03/14/2011
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 03/14/2011
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 03/14/2011
Rep. Rigell, E. Scott [R-VA-2] 03/14/2011
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 03/14/2011
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7] 03/14/2011
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 03/14/2011
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large] 03/14/2011
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 03/14/2011
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 03/14/2011
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 03/14/2011
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 03/14/2011
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 03/14/2011
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 03/14/2011
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 03/14/2011
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 03/14/2011
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 03/14/2011
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-18] 03/14/2011
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 03/14/2011
Rep. Rodgers, Cathy McMorris [R-WA-5] 03/14/2011
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 03/14/2011
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 03/14/2011
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 03/14/2011
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3] 03/14/2011
Rep. Landry, Jeffrey M. [R-LA-3] 03/14/2011
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-5] 03/14/2011
Rep. Herrera Beutler, Jaime [R-WA-3] 03/14/2011
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 03/14/2011
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 03/14/2011
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 03/14/2011
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-29] 03/14/2011
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 03/14/2011
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 03/14/2011
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-19] 03/14/2011
Rep. Schilling, Robert T. [R-IL-17] 03/14/2011
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 03/14/2011
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 03/14/2011
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 03/14/2011
Rep. Woodall, Rob [R-GA-7] 03/14/2011
Rep. Amash, Justin [R-MI-3] 03/14/2011
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 03/14/2011
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4] 03/14/2011
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 03/17/2011
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 03/17/2011
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 03/17/2011
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 03/17/2011
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 03/30/2011
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 05/11/2011

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means03/04/2011 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.937.


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.937. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (03/04/2011)

Rising Tides Act of 2011 - Amends the Internal Revenue Code to: (1) reduce from 35% to 23% the maximum income tax rate for corporations, including personal service corporations; and (2) repeal certain requirements and limitations on the tax deduction for cash dividends received by a corporation which is a U.S. shareholder from a controlled foreign corporation and make such deduction permanent.