Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 03/08/2011
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2]* 03/08/2011
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 03/17/2011
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 03/17/2011
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 03/17/2011
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 03/17/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 03/17/2011
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 03/29/2011
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 03/29/2011
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 03/29/2011
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3] 03/29/2011
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 03/30/2011
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 03/30/2011
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 04/01/2011
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 04/01/2011
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 04/01/2011
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 04/01/2011
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 04/01/2011
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 04/01/2011
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 04/01/2011
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 04/01/2011
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 04/08/2011
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 04/08/2011
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 04/08/2011
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 04/14/2011
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 04/14/2011
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 04/15/2011
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 05/10/2011
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 05/10/2011
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 06/03/2011
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 06/23/2011
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 08/01/2011
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 08/01/2011
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 10/04/2011
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 10/25/2011
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 11/14/2011
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 12/14/2011
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 12/14/2011
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 12/14/2011
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 12/16/2011
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 01/17/2012
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 01/17/2012
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 01/23/2012
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 01/24/2012
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 01/24/2012
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 02/02/2012
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 05/30/2012
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 05/30/2012