Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 03/08/2011
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3]* 03/08/2011
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 03/08/2011
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5]* 03/08/2011
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 03/08/2011
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 03/17/2011
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 03/30/2011
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 03/30/2011
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 03/30/2011
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 03/30/2011
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 03/31/2011
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 04/01/2011
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4] 04/04/2011
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 04/04/2011
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 04/06/2011
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 04/07/2011
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 04/07/2011
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 04/15/2011
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 05/02/2011
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 05/10/2011
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 05/10/2011
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 05/23/2011
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 05/23/2011
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 05/26/2011
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 05/31/2011
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 06/13/2011
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-41] 06/13/2011
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 06/14/2011
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 06/15/2011
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 06/16/2011
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 06/21/2011
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 06/22/2011
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 07/06/2011
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 07/14/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 07/15/2011
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 07/15/2011
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 07/20/2011
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 07/27/2011
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 07/28/2011
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 07/29/2011
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 08/05/2011
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 08/05/2011
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 08/05/2011
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 08/05/2011
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 08/05/2011
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 08/30/2011
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 09/07/2011
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-24] 09/29/2011
Rep. Dold, Robert J. [R-IL-10] 10/05/2011
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 10/26/2011
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 11/04/2011
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 11/04/2011
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 11/18/2011
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 12/05/2011
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 12/13/2011
Rep. Clarke, Hansen [D-MI-13] 03/19/2012
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 03/29/2012
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 03/29/2012
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-29] 04/19/2012
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 04/19/2012
Rep. Berg, Rick [R-ND-At Large] 04/19/2012
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 04/19/2012
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 04/19/2012
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 04/19/2012
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 04/24/2012
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4] 05/11/2012
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 05/11/2012
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 05/11/2012
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 05/11/2012
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 05/30/2012
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 05/30/2012
Rep. Schilling, Robert T. [R-IL-17] 05/30/2012
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 05/30/2012
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 05/30/2012
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 05/30/2012
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 05/31/2012
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 05/31/2012
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 05/31/2012
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-11] 05/31/2012
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 05/31/2012
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 06/06/2012
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 06/06/2012
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 06/06/2012
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 06/06/2012
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 06/08/2012
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 06/08/2012
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 06/21/2012
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 06/21/2012
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 06/21/2012
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 06/29/2012
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 06/29/2012
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 07/19/2012
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 07/19/2012
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 07/19/2012
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 07/19/2012
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 07/19/2012
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 07/26/2012
Rep. Critz, Mark S. [D-PA-12] 07/26/2012
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-19] 08/01/2012
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 08/01/2012
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2] 08/01/2012
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 08/02/2012
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 08/02/2012
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 09/12/2012
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 09/12/2012
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 09/19/2012