Text: H.R.944 — 112th Congress (2011-2012)All Information (Except Text)

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Referred in Senate (12/08/2011)


112th CONGRESS
1st Session
H. R. 944


IN THE SENATE OF THE UNITED STATES

December 8, 2011

Received; read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources


AN ACT

To eliminate an unused lighthouse reservation, provide management consistency by incorporating the rocks and small islands along the coast of Orange County, California, into the California Coastal National Monument managed by the Bureau of Land Management, and meet the original Congressional intent of preserving Orange County’s rocks and small islands, and for other purposes.

Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives of the United States of America in Congress assembled,

SECTION 1. Preservation of rocks and small islands along the coast of Orange County, California.

(a) California Coastal National Monument.—The Act of February 18, 1931, entitled “An Act to reserve for public use rocks, pinnacles, reefs, and small islands along the seacoast of Orange County, California” is amended by striking “temporarily reserved” and all that follows through “United States” and inserting “part of the California Coastal National Monument and shall be administered as such”.

(b) Repeal of Reservation.—Section 31 of the Act of May 28, 1935, entitled “An Act to authorize the Secretary of Commerce to dispose of certain lighthouse reservations, and for other purposes” is hereby repealed.

Passed the House of Representatives December 7, 2011.

    Attest: karen l. haas,   
    Clerk.