Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1]* 03/08/2011
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3]* 03/08/2011
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 03/08/2011
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3]* 03/08/2011
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10]* 03/08/2011
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11]* 03/08/2011
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25]* 03/08/2011
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6]* 03/08/2011
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 03/11/2011
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 03/16/2011
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 03/31/2011
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 07/15/2011
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 07/15/2011
Rep. Walsh, Joe [R-IL-8] 10/05/2011
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 01/25/2012