Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52] 03/09/2011
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 03/09/2011
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 03/09/2011
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 03/09/2011
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 03/09/2011
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/11/2011
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 03/15/2011
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 03/31/2011
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 04/05/2011
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-13] 05/02/2011
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 05/10/2011
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 05/31/2011
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 05/31/2011
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 06/14/2011
Rep. Dold, Robert J. [R-IL-10] 06/14/2011
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 07/06/2011
Rep. Hochul, Kathleen C. [D-NY-26] 07/13/2011
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-11] 07/13/2011
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 07/13/2011
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 07/21/2011
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 07/25/2011
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 07/25/2011
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 08/01/2011
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 09/07/2011
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 09/12/2011
Rep. Rivera, David [R-FL-25] 09/20/2011
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-23] 10/03/2011
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-10] 10/03/2011
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 10/24/2011
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 10/24/2011
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-21] 11/15/2011
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 12/08/2011
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 12/19/2011