Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11]* 03/09/2011
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 03/09/2011
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 03/09/2011
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1]* 03/09/2011
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3]* 03/09/2011
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6]* 03/09/2011
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 03/14/2011
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 03/14/2011
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 03/14/2011
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 03/14/2011
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 03/14/2011
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 03/15/2011
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 03/15/2011
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 03/15/2011
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 03/15/2011
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 04/01/2011
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-33] 04/01/2011
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 04/01/2011
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 04/01/2011
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 04/01/2011
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 04/01/2011
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 04/01/2011
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 04/06/2011
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 04/06/2011
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 04/06/2011
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 04/06/2011
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 05/03/2011
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 05/03/2011
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 05/03/2011
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 05/03/2011
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 05/03/2011
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 05/05/2011
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 05/11/2011
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 06/03/2011
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 06/15/2011
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 02/28/2012
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 02/29/2012
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 03/07/2012
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 03/21/2012
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 03/26/2012
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 03/26/2012
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-23] 03/26/2012
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 09/12/2012