Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 03/11/2011
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 03/11/2011
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 03/11/2011
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 03/11/2011
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 03/11/2011
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 03/11/2011
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 03/11/2011
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 03/11/2011
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 03/11/2011
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 03/11/2011
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 03/11/2011
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 03/11/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 03/11/2011
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 03/15/2011
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 03/15/2011
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 03/15/2011
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 03/15/2011
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/15/2011
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 03/15/2011
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 03/30/2011
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 03/30/2011
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 03/30/2011
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/30/2011
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 03/30/2011
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 03/30/2011
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 03/30/2011
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 03/30/2011
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 03/30/2011
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 03/30/2011
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 03/30/2011
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 04/04/2011
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 04/04/2011
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 04/04/2011
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 04/04/2011
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 04/05/2011
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 04/05/2011
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 04/08/2011
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 04/11/2011
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 04/11/2011
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 04/11/2011
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 04/15/2011
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 04/15/2011
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 05/04/2011
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 05/04/2011
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 05/04/2011
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 05/04/2011
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 05/05/2011
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 05/05/2011
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 05/10/2011
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 05/10/2011
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 05/10/2011
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 05/10/2011
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 05/10/2011
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 05/11/2011
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19] 05/11/2011
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 05/11/2011
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 05/13/2011
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 05/26/2011
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 06/03/2011
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/14/2011
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 07/11/2011
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 07/11/2011
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 08/05/2011
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 09/08/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 10/24/2011
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 10/24/2011
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 10/24/2011
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 10/24/2011
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 10/24/2011
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 10/24/2011
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 11/25/2011
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 11/25/2011
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 11/25/2011
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 12/12/2011
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 01/10/2012
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 01/23/2012
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 01/31/2012
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-36] 02/06/2012
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 05/30/2012
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 05/30/2012
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 05/30/2012
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 06/07/2012
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 06/26/2012
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 07/17/2012
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 07/17/2012
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 07/19/2012
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 07/31/2012
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 08/01/2012
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 08/01/2012
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 08/02/2012
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 09/19/2012
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 10/05/2012