Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Bono, Mary [R-CA-45]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Lee, Christopher J. [R-NY-26]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24]* 01/05/2011
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4]* 01/05/2011
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 01/07/2011
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 01/07/2011
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 01/07/2011
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 01/07/2011
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 01/07/2011
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 01/07/2011
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 01/07/2011
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 01/07/2011
Rep. Young, Todd C. [R-IN-9] 01/07/2011
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 01/07/2011
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 01/07/2011
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 01/07/2011
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 01/07/2011
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 01/07/2011
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 01/07/2011
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 01/07/2011
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 01/07/2011
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 01/07/2011
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 01/12/2011
Rep. Canseco, Francisco "Quico" [R-TX-23] 01/12/2011
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-18] 01/12/2011
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 01/12/2011
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 01/12/2011
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 01/12/2011
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16] 01/12/2011
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 01/12/2011
Rep. Hayworth, Nan A. S. [R-NY-19] 01/12/2011
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 01/12/2011
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 01/12/2011
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 01/12/2011
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4] 01/12/2011
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 01/12/2011
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1] 01/12/2011
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 01/18/2011
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4] 01/18/2011
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 01/18/2011
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 01/18/2011
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 01/18/2011
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 01/18/2011
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 01/18/2011
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 01/18/2011
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 01/18/2011
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 01/18/2011
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-41] 01/18/2011
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 01/18/2011
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12] 01/18/2011
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 01/18/2011
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 01/18/2011
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 01/18/2011
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 01/18/2011
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 01/19/2011
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 01/19/2011
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 01/19/2011
Rep. Quayle, Benjamin [R-AZ-3] 01/19/2011
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 01/24/2011
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 01/24/2011
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5] 01/24/2011
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9] 01/24/2011
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-9] 01/24/2011
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 01/24/2011
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 01/24/2011
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 01/25/2011
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 01/25/2011
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 01/26/2011
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 01/26/2011
Rep. Austria, Steve [R-OH-7] 01/26/2011
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 01/26/2011
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 02/08/2011
Rep. Labrador, Raul R. [R-ID-1] 02/08/2011
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 02/08/2011
Rep. Guinta, Frank C. [R-NH-1] 02/08/2011
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 02/08/2011
Rep. Landry, Jeffrey M. [R-LA-3] 02/08/2011
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 02/10/2011
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 02/17/2011
Rep. Hurt, Robert [R-VA-5] 03/03/2011
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 03/08/2011
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 03/08/2011
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 03/08/2011