There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Secret Ballot Protection Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the National Labor Relations Act to ensure the right of employees to a secret ballot election conducted by the National Labor Relations Board.

Actions Overview (1)

03/09/2011 Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

03/21/2011 Referred to the Subcommittee on Health, Employment, Labor, and Pensions.
Action By: Committee on Education and the Workforce
03/09/2011 Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/09/2011 Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (71)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2]* 03/09/2011
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 03/09/2011
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5]* 03/09/2011
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52]* 03/09/2011
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5]* 03/09/2011
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7]* 03/09/2011
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4]* 03/09/2011
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-24]* 03/09/2011
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4]* 03/09/2011
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8]* 03/09/2011
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4]* 03/09/2011
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large]* 03/09/2011
Rep. Roby, Martha [R-AL-2]* 03/09/2011
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3]* 03/09/2011
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12]* 03/09/2011
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3]* 03/09/2011
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6]* 03/09/2011
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4]* 03/09/2011
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5]* 03/09/2011
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 03/30/2011
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 03/30/2011
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 05/02/2011
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 05/02/2011
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2] 05/02/2011
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 05/02/2011
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 05/02/2011
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 05/02/2011
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 05/03/2011
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-5] 05/03/2011
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 05/03/2011
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 05/10/2011
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 05/10/2011
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 05/10/2011
Rep. Herrera Beutler, Jaime [R-WA-3] 05/11/2011
Rep. Woodall, Rob [R-GA-7] 05/13/2011
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 05/23/2011
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 05/23/2011
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 05/24/2011
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 05/24/2011
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-18] 05/24/2011
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 05/24/2011
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 05/25/2011
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 05/31/2011
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 06/02/2011
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 06/15/2011
Rep. West, Allen B. [R-FL-22] 06/15/2011
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 06/16/2011
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 06/16/2011
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 06/16/2011
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 06/21/2011
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 06/21/2011
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 06/21/2011
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 06/21/2011
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 07/06/2011
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 07/06/2011
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 07/18/2011
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4] 07/21/2011
Rep. Rigell, E. Scott [R-VA-2] 07/29/2011
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 08/09/2011
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 08/09/2011
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 09/07/2011
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 09/07/2011
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 11/16/2011
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 03/05/2012
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 03/06/2012
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 03/20/2012
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 03/29/2012
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 05/08/2012
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 07/12/2012
Rep. Canseco, Francisco "Quico" [R-TX-23] 07/31/2012
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 09/10/2012

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Education and the Workforce03/09/2011 Referred to
House Education and the Workforce Subcommittee on Health, Employment, Labor, and Pensions03/21/2011 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.

Subjects (4)

  • Administrative law and regulatory procedures
  • Labor-management relations
  • National Labor Relations Board (NLRB)

Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.972. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (03/09/2011)

Secret Ballot Protection Act - Amends the National Labor Relations Act to make it an unfair labor practice for: (1) an employer to recognize or bargain collectively with a labor organization that has not been selected by a majority of the employees in a unit appropriate for such purposes in a secret ballot election conducted by the National Labor Relations Board (NLRB), and (2) a labor organization to cause or attempt to cause an employer to recognize or bargain collectively with a representative that has not been selected in such manner.