Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/12/2011
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 05/12/2011
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 05/12/2011
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 05/12/2011
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 05/12/2011
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 05/12/2011
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 05/12/2011
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 06/22/2011
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/19/2011
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 12/16/2011
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 02/07/2012
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 02/07/2012
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 07/10/2012
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 07/10/2012