Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4]* 03/09/2011
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 03/15/2011
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 03/16/2011
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 03/31/2011
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 04/05/2011
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 04/14/2011
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 04/14/2011
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 04/14/2011