Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49]* 01/05/2011
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 02/08/2011
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 02/08/2011
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 03/09/2011
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 04/01/2011
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 07/08/2011