Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2]* 03/09/2011
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4]* 03/09/2011
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6]* 03/09/2011
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 03/09/2011
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6]* 03/09/2011
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17]* 03/09/2011
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1]* 03/09/2011
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 03/09/2011
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 03/09/2011
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 03/09/2011
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1]* 03/09/2011
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 03/10/2011
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 03/10/2011
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 03/10/2011
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 03/10/2011
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 03/10/2011
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 03/11/2011
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 03/11/2011
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 03/11/2011
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 03/11/2011
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12] 03/14/2011
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 03/14/2011
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 03/14/2011
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 03/14/2011
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 03/14/2011
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 03/14/2011
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 03/14/2011
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 03/14/2011
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 03/14/2011
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 03/14/2011
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 03/14/2011
Rep. Walsh, Joe [R-IL-8] 03/14/2011
Rep. Guinta, Frank C. [R-NH-1] 03/14/2011
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3] 03/14/2011
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 03/14/2011
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 03/14/2011
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 03/14/2011
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 03/14/2011
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 03/14/2011
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-18] 03/15/2011
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 03/15/2011
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 03/15/2011
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 03/15/2011
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 03/15/2011
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 03/15/2011
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 03/15/2011
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 03/15/2011
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 03/15/2011
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4] 03/15/2011
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4] 03/15/2011
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9] 03/15/2011
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 03/15/2011
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 03/15/2011
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 03/15/2011
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 03/17/2011
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 03/17/2011
Rep. Adams, Sandy [R-FL-24] 03/29/2011
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 03/29/2011
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 03/29/2011
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 03/29/2011
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-13] 03/29/2011
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 03/29/2011
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 03/29/2011
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 03/30/2011
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large] 03/30/2011
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 03/31/2011
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 03/31/2011
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 03/31/2011
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 03/31/2011
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 04/04/2011
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 04/04/2011
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 04/04/2011
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 04/04/2011
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3] 04/07/2011
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 04/07/2011
Rep. Austria, Steve [R-OH-7] 04/14/2011
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 04/15/2011
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 05/05/2011
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 05/05/2011
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 05/05/2011
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 05/26/2011
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 09/07/2011
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 09/14/2011
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 11/15/2011