Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 03/09/2011
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 03/09/2011
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24]* 03/09/2011
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9]* 03/09/2011
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 03/11/2011
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 03/14/2011
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 03/29/2011
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 05/10/2011
Rep. Clarke, Hansen [D-MI-13] 06/19/2012