Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 04/06/2011
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 04/06/2011
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 05/03/2011
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 05/03/2011
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 05/03/2011
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 05/03/2011
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 05/10/2011
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 05/10/2011
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 05/10/2011
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 05/10/2011
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 05/10/2011
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 05/10/2011
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 05/13/2011
Rep. Landry, Jeffrey M. [R-LA-3] 05/13/2011
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 05/13/2011
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 05/13/2011
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 05/13/2011
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 05/24/2011
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 05/24/2011
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 05/31/2011
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 05/31/2011
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 05/31/2011
Rep. Labrador, Raul R. [R-ID-1] 05/31/2011
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 05/31/2011
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 05/31/2011
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 05/31/2011
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 06/03/2011
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 06/23/2011
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 06/23/2011
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52] 06/23/2011
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large] 07/07/2011
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-24] 09/13/2011
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-19] 09/13/2011
Rep. Austria, Steve [R-OH-7] 09/22/2011
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3] 10/06/2011