There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

English Language Unity Act of 2011

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To declare English as the official language of the United States, to establish a uniform English language rule for naturalization, and to avoid misconstructions of the English language texts of the laws of the United States, pursuant to Congress' powers to provide for the general welfare of the United States and to establish a uniform rule of naturalization under article I, section 8, of the Constitution.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
03/10/2011Introduced in House

All Actions (6)

Date
08/02/2012Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Judiciary Subcommittee on Constitution
03/21/2011Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
03/10/2011Referred to House Judiciary
Action By: House of Representatives
03/10/2011Referred to House Education and the Workforce
Action By: House of Representatives
03/10/2011Referred to the Committee on Education and the Workforce, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/10/2011Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (122)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 03/10/2011
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 03/10/2011
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3]* 03/10/2011
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12]* 03/10/2011
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 03/10/2011
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6]* 03/10/2011
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15]* 03/10/2011
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10]* 03/10/2011
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14]* 03/10/2011
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1]* 03/10/2011
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 03/10/2011
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 03/10/2011
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4]* 03/10/2011
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 03/10/2011
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 03/10/2011
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7]* 03/10/2011
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18]* 03/10/2011
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6]* 03/10/2011
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13]* 03/10/2011
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 03/10/2011
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 03/10/2011
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46]* 03/10/2011
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5]* 03/10/2011
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 03/10/2011
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4]* 03/10/2011
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 03/10/2011
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42]* 03/10/2011
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 03/10/2011
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48]* 03/10/2011
Rep. Adams, Sandy [R-FL-24]* 03/10/2011
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 03/10/2011
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 03/10/2011
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-26]* 03/10/2011
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1]* 03/10/2011
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 03/10/2011
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4]* 03/10/2011
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 03/10/2011
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8]* 03/10/2011
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 03/10/2011
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 03/10/2011
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 03/10/2011
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 03/10/2011
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 03/10/2011
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5]* 03/10/2011
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 03/10/2011
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4]* 03/10/2011
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 03/10/2011
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 03/10/2011
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1]* 03/10/2011
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 03/10/2011
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3]* 03/10/2011
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 03/10/2011
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4]* 03/10/2011
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 03/10/2011
Rep. Rigell, E. Scott [R-VA-2]* 03/10/2011
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1]* 03/10/2011
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6]* 03/10/2011
Rep. West, Allen B. [R-FL-22]* 03/10/2011
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7]* 03/10/2011
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 03/10/2011
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-18] 03/15/2011
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 03/15/2011
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 03/15/2011
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2] 03/31/2011
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 03/31/2011
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 03/31/2011
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 03/31/2011
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 03/31/2011
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 03/31/2011
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 03/31/2011
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 03/31/2011
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 03/31/2011
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52] 04/08/2011
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 05/04/2011
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 05/04/2011
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 05/04/2011
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 05/04/2011
Rep. Herrera Beutler, Jaime [R-WA-3] 05/04/2011
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 05/04/2011
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 05/04/2011
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 05/04/2011
Rep. Scott, Tim [R-SC-1] 05/04/2011
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 05/12/2011
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 05/12/2011
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 05/12/2011
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 06/13/2011
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 06/13/2011
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 06/13/2011
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 06/13/2011
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 06/13/2011
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-5] 06/15/2011
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 06/15/2011
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 06/15/2011
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 06/15/2011
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 07/12/2011
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 07/12/2011
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 07/12/2011
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 07/12/2011
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 07/22/2011
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 08/01/2011
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 09/07/2011
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 09/12/2011
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 09/21/2011
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 09/29/2011
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 10/05/2011
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 12/02/2011
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1] 02/02/2012
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 02/02/2012
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 02/07/2012
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 03/21/2012
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 03/21/2012
Rep. Quayle, Benjamin [R-AZ-3] 03/29/2012
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-5] 04/19/2012
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 05/30/2012
Rep. Labrador, Raul R. [R-ID-1] 06/05/2012
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 06/07/2012
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 06/27/2012
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 06/27/2012
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 07/09/2012
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 07/13/2012
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 07/23/2012
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 07/31/2012

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Education and the Workforce03/10/2011 Referred to
House Judiciary03/10/2011 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Constitution03/21/2011 Referred to
08/02/2012 Hearings by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.997. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (03/10/2011)

English Language Unity Act of 2011- Makes English the official language of the United States.

Requires, subject to exceptions and rules of construction, that: (1) official functions of the United States be conducted in English; and (2) all naturalization ceremonies be conducted in English. Establishes a uniform English language rule for naturalization.

Makes English language requirements and workplace policies, whether in the public or private sector, presumptively consistent with the laws of the United States.

Directs the Secretary of Homeland Security to issue for public notice and comment a proposed rule for uniform testing of English language ability of candidates for naturalization based upon the principles that: (1) all citizens should be able to read and understand generally the English language text of the Declaration of Independence, the Constitution, and the laws of the United States; and (2) any exceptions to this standard should be limited to extraordinary circumstances, such as asylum.