Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 03/22/2012
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 03/28/2012
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 04/18/2012
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 04/18/2012
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 04/27/2012
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 05/17/2012
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 05/17/2012
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 07/12/2012
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 07/25/2012
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 09/10/2012
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 09/14/2012
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 09/21/2012

Show cosponsors who withdrew