There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Permitting the use of the rotunda of the Capitol for a ceremony as part of the commemoration of the days of remembrance of victims of the Holocaust.


Actions Overview (4)

Date
03/22/2012Passed/agreed to in Senate: Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S2006)
03/21/2012Passed/agreed to in House: On agreeing to the resolution Agreed to without objection.(text: CR H1442)
03/21/2012Committee on House Administration discharged.
03/19/2012Introduced in House

All Actions (10)

Date Chamber
03/27/2012SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
03/22/2012SenateResolution agreed to in Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2006)
03/21/2012SenateReceived in the Senate.
03/21/2012-12:39pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
03/21/2012-12:39pmHouseOn agreeing to the resolution Agreed to without objection. (text: CR H1442)
03/21/2012-12:38pmHouseConsidered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H1442)
03/21/2012HouseCommittee on House Administration discharged.
03/21/2012-12:38pmHouseMr. Nugent asked unanimous consent to discharge from committee and consider.
03/19/2012HouseReferred to the House Committee on House Administration.
03/19/2012HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (4)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-13]* 03/19/2012
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 03/19/2012
Rep. Hayworth, Nan A. S. [R-NY-19]* 03/19/2012
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 03/19/2012

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Administration03/19/2012 Referred to
03/21/2012 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.Con.Res.108. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate without amendment (03/22/2012)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Authorizes the use of the Capitol rotunda on April 19, 2012, for a ceremony as part of the commemoration of the days of remembrance of victims of the Holocaust.