Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12]* 03/22/2012
Rep. West, Allen B. [R-FL-22]* 03/22/2012
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 03/22/2012
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2]* 03/22/2012
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-5]* 03/22/2012
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8]* 03/22/2012
Rep. Schilling, Robert T. [R-IL-17]* 03/22/2012
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8]* 03/22/2012
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11]* 03/22/2012
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-29]* 03/22/2012
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17]* 03/22/2012
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 03/22/2012
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2]* 03/22/2012
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 03/27/2012
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 03/27/2012
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 03/27/2012
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 03/27/2012
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9] 03/27/2012
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4] 03/27/2012
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 03/27/2012
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 03/27/2012
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 03/27/2012
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 03/27/2012
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 03/28/2012
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 03/28/2012
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 03/28/2012
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5] 03/28/2012
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 03/28/2012
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 03/28/2012
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 03/28/2012
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 03/28/2012
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-5] 03/28/2012
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 03/29/2012
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 03/29/2012
Rep. Quayle, Benjamin [R-AZ-3] 03/29/2012
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1] 03/29/2012
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 03/29/2012
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 04/16/2012
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 04/16/2012
Rep. Landry, Jeffrey M. [R-LA-3] 04/18/2012
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 04/18/2012
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 04/19/2012
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 04/27/2012
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 05/07/2012
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 06/20/2012
Rep. Turner, Robert L. [R-NY-9] 06/27/2012