Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 03/26/2012
Rep. Canseco, Francisco "Quico" [R-TX-23] 04/16/2012
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 04/24/2012
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 05/31/2012
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9] 06/06/2012
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 06/19/2012
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 06/20/2012
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 07/10/2012