Refine your search

Refined by:

Illinois Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 04/18/2012
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 07/11/2012
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 07/31/2012
Rep. Walsh, Joe [R-IL-8] 07/31/2012
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 09/19/2012
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 09/21/2012