There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Authorizing the use of the Capitol Grounds for the District of Columbia Special Olympics Law Enforcement Torch Run.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
05/09/2012Passed/agreed to in Senate: Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S3049)
05/07/2012Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 375 - 0 (Roll no. 198).(text: CR H2298)
04/24/2012Introduced in House

All Actions (13)

Date Chamber
05/10/2012SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
05/09/2012SenateResolution agreed to in Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S3049)
05/08/2012SenateReceived in the Senate.
05/07/2012-7:11pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
05/07/2012-7:11pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 375 - 0 (Roll no. 198). (text: CR H2298)
05/07/2012-7:05pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H2302-2303)
05/07/2012-4:54pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
05/07/2012-4:50pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Con. Res. 118.
05/07/2012-4:50pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H2298-2299)
05/07/2012-4:50pmHouseMr. Denham moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution.
04/25/2012HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
04/24/2012HouseReferred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure.
04/24/2012HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-19]* 04/24/2012

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Transportation and Infrastructure04/24/2012 Referred to
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management04/25/2012 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.Con.Res.118. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate without amendment (05/09/2012)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Authorizes the use of the Capitol grounds for the 26th Annual District of Columbia Special Olympics Law Enforcement Torch Run on June 1, 2012.