Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 04/24/2012
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 05/07/2012
Rep. Clarke, Hansen [D-MI-13] 05/07/2012
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 05/07/2012
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 05/07/2012
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 05/07/2012
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 05/07/2012
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-36] 06/07/2012
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 06/07/2012
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 06/07/2012
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 06/19/2012
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 06/21/2012
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/28/2012