There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Expressing the sense of Congress that an appropriate site on Chaplains Hill in Arlington National Cemetery should be provided for a memorial marker to honor the memory of the Jewish chaplains who died while on active duty in the Armed Forces of the United States.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
01/25/2011Introduced in House

All Actions (7)

Date
05/12/2011Provisions of measure incorporated into HR 1627.
05/03/2011Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs
02/25/2011Referred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
02/04/2011Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
Action By: Committee on Armed Services
01/25/2011Referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/25/2011Referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/25/2011Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (82)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20]* 01/25/2011
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 01/25/2011
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 01/25/2011
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16]* 01/25/2011
Rep. West, Allen B. [R-FL-22]* 01/25/2011
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-13]* 01/25/2011
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 02/08/2011
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 02/08/2011
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 02/08/2011
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 02/08/2011
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 02/08/2011
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 02/08/2011
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 02/08/2011
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 02/08/2011
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 02/08/2011
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 02/08/2011
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 02/08/2011
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 02/08/2011
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 02/08/2011
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 02/08/2011
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 02/08/2011
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 02/08/2011
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19] 02/08/2011
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 02/08/2011
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 02/17/2011
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 02/17/2011
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 02/17/2011
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 02/17/2011
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 02/17/2011
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 02/17/2011
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 02/17/2011
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 02/17/2011
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 02/17/2011
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-10] 02/17/2011
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 02/17/2011
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 02/17/2011
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 02/17/2011
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3] 03/03/2011
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 03/03/2011
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 03/03/2011
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 03/03/2011
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 03/03/2011
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 03/03/2011
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 03/03/2011
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 03/03/2011
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 03/03/2011
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 03/03/2011
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 03/03/2011
Rep. Hayworth, Nan A. S. [R-NY-19] 03/03/2011
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 03/03/2011
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 03/03/2011
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 03/11/2011
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 03/11/2011
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 03/11/2011
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 03/11/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 03/11/2011
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 03/11/2011
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 03/11/2011
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 03/11/2011
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 03/11/2011
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 03/16/2011
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 03/16/2011
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 03/16/2011
Rep. Walsh, Joe [R-IL-8] 03/16/2011
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 03/16/2011
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 03/30/2011
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 03/30/2011
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 03/30/2011
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 04/15/2011
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 04/15/2011
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 04/15/2011
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 04/15/2011
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 05/04/2011
Rep. Adams, Sandy [R-FL-24] 05/04/2011
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 05/04/2011
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 05/04/2011
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 05/23/2011
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 05/23/2011
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 05/23/2011
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 05/23/2011
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 05/23/2011
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-17] 05/23/2011

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Veterans' Affairs01/25/2011 Referred to
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs02/25/2011 Referred to
05/03/2011 Hearings by
House Armed Services01/25/2011 Referred to
House Armed Services Subcommittee on Military Personnel02/04/2011 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.Con.Res.12. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/25/2011)

Expresses the sense of Congress that an appropriate site on Chaplains Hill in Arlington National Cemetery be provided for a memorial marker, to be paid for with private funds, to honor the memory of the Jewish chaplains who died while on active duty in the U.S. Armed Forces, so long as the Secretary of the Army has exclusive authority to approve the design and site of the memorial marker.