Text: H.Con.Res.12 — 112th Congress (2011-2012)All Bill Information (Except Text)

There is one version of the bill.

Bill text available as:

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/25/2011)


Formatting necessary for an accurate reading of this legislative text may be shown by tags (e.g., <DELETED> or <BOLD>) or may be missing from this TXT display. For complete and accurate display of this text, see the PDF or HTML/XML.




[Congressional Bills 112th Congress]
[From the U.S. Government Printing Office]
[H. Con. Res. 12 Introduced in House (IH)]

112th CONGRESS
  1st Session
H. CON. RES. 12

Expressing the sense of Congress that an appropriate site on Chaplains 
 Hill in Arlington National Cemetery should be provided for a memorial 
 marker to honor the memory of the Jewish chaplains who died while on 
         active duty in the Armed Forces of the United States.


_______________________________________________________________________


                    IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES

                            January 25, 2011

Mr. Weiner (for himself, Ms. Wasserman Schultz, Mr. Israel, Mr. Larson 
  of Connecticut, Mr. Rooney, Mr. West, and Mr. Grimm) submitted the 
following concurrent resolution; which was referred to the Committee on 
Veterans' Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on Armed Services, 
for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case 
for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of 
                        the committee concerned

_______________________________________________________________________

                         CONCURRENT RESOLUTION


 
Expressing the sense of Congress that an appropriate site on Chaplains 
 Hill in Arlington National Cemetery should be provided for a memorial 
 marker to honor the memory of the Jewish chaplains who died while on 
         active duty in the Armed Forces of the United States.

Whereas 13 Jewish chaplains have died while on active duty in the Armed Forces 
        of the United States;
Whereas Army Chaplain Rabbi Alexander Goode died on February 3, 1943, when then 
        USS Dorchester was sunk by German torpedoes off the coast of Greenland;
Whereas Chaplain Goode received the Four Chaplains' Medal for Heroism and the 
        Distinguished Service Cross for his heroic efforts to save the lives of 
        those onboard the Dorchester;
Whereas Army Chaplain Rabbi Irving Tepper was killed in action in France on 
        August 13, 1944;
Whereas Chaplain Tepper also saw combat in Morocco, Tunisia, and Sicily while 
        attached to an infantry combat team in the Ninth Division;
Whereas Army Chaplain Rabbi Louis Werfel died on December 24, 1944, at the young 
        age of 27, in a plane crash while en route to conduct Chanukah services;
Whereas Chaplain Werfel was known as ``The Flying Rabbi'' because his duties 
        required traveling great distances by plane to serve Army personnel of 
        Jewish faith at outlying posts;
Whereas Army Chaplain Rabbi Meir Engel died at the Naval Hospital in Saigon on 
        December 16, 1964, after faithfully serving his country during WWII, the 
        Korean War, and the Vietnam War;
Whereas Army Chaplain Rabbi Morton Singer died on December 17, 1968, in a plane 
        crash while on a mission in Vietnam to conduct Chanukah services;
Whereas Army Chaplain Rabbi Herman Rosen died in service of his faith and his 
        country on June 18, 1943;
Whereas his son, Air Force Chaplain Solomon Rosen, also died in service of his 
        faith and his country on November 2, 1948;
Whereas Army Chaplain Rabbi Nachman Arnoff died in service of his faith and his 
        country on May 9, 1946;
Whereas Army Chaplain Rabbi Frank Goldenberg died in service of his faith and 
        his country on May 22, 1946;
Whereas Army Chaplain Rabbi Henry Goody died in service of his faith and his 
        country on October 19, 1943;
Whereas Army Chaplain Rabbi Samuel Hurwitz died in service of his faith and his 
        country on December 9, 1943;
Whereas Air Force Chaplain Rabbi Samuel Rosen died in service of his faith and 
        his country on May 13, 1955;
Whereas Air Force Chaplain Rabbi David Sobel died in service of his faith and 
        his country on March 7, 1974;
Whereas Chaplains Hill in Arlington National Cemetery memorializes the names of 
        242 chaplains who perished while on active duty in the Armed Forces of 
        the United States; and
Whereas none of the 13 Jewish chaplains who have died while on active duty are 
        memorialized on Chaplains Hill: Now, therefore, be it
    Resolved by the House of Representatives (the Senate concurring), 
That it is the sense of Congress that an appropriate site on Chaplains 
Hill in Arlington National Cemetery should be provided for a memorial 
marker, to be paid for with private funds, to honor the memory of the 
Jewish chaplains who died while on active duty in the Armed Forces of 
the United States, so long as the Secretary of the Army has exclusive 
authority to approve the design and site of the memorial marker.
                                 <all>